NC H712 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-5)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Disposition of Unclaimed or Seized Firearms

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disposition of Unclaimed or Seized Firearms

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-06HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-05-03HousePlaced On Cal For 05/06/2019
2019-05-03HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-03HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-26HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-26HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-15HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-15HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-10HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback