NC H714 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Education/Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Education/Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Competency-Based Assessments
Title
Competency-Based Assessments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-05-03 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-02 | House | Added to Calendar |
2019-05-02 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/03/2019 |
2019-05-02 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-05-02 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-30 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-30 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-15 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Filed |