NC H715 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-17 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-17 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Support Firefighters Week
Title
Support Firefighters Week
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-17 - House - R2 For Adopt (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-17 | Adopted | |
2011-05-12 | Placed On Cal For 5/17/2011 | |
2011-05-12 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-04-07 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-06 | Filed |