NC H716 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Advisory Council for PANS(PANDAS)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Advisory Council for PANS(PANDAS)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-06SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-06SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2019-05-06HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-06HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-06HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-03HousePlaced On Cal For 05/06/2019
2019-05-03HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-03HouseReptd Fav
2019-05-02HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-02HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-15HouseRef to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-15HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-11HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback