NC H72 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Support Multiple Recesses For Lincoln Co Schl
Title
Support Multiple Recesses For Lincoln Co Schl
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Saine [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-02-28 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-02-27 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2019-02-27 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-02-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-02-27 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2019-02-25 | House | Placed On Cal For 02/27/2019 |
2019-02-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-02-25 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-02-20 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-02-20 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-02-14 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-02-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed |