NC H724 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Ch. SL 2019-188
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Ch. SL 2019-188
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Truth in Caller ID Act
Title
Truth in Caller ID Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-01 | Ch. SL 2019-188 | |
2019-08-01 | Signed by Gov. 8/1/2019 | |
2019-07-24 | Pres. To Gov. 7/24/2019 | |
2019-07-23 | Ratified | |
2019-07-22 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-07-22 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-07-22 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-07-16 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/22/2019 |
2019-07-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-07-15 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/16/2019 |
2019-07-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/15/2019 |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/10/2019 |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/09/2019 |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/08/2019 |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Commerce and Insurance |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-05-06 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/03/2019 |
2019-05-02 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-04-30 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/02/2019 |
2019-04-30 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-04-29 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-04-29 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-25 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-15 | House | Ref to the Com on Commerce, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Filed |