NC H73 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Civic Responsibility Education

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civic Responsibility Education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-07SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-07SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-03-07HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-03-06HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-06HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-04HousePlaced On Cal For 03/06/2019
2019-03-04HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-03-04HouseReptd Fav
2019-02-26HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-26HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-02-14HouseRef to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-14HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-13HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback