NC H730 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Ch. SL 2011-310
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Ch. SL 2011-310
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local Bds of Education/403(b) Option
Title
Local Bds of Education/403(b) Option
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - A1 Fisher\Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - A1 Fisher\Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-27 | Ch. SL 2011-310 | |
2011-06-27 | Signed By Gov. 6/27/2011 | |
2011-06-17 | Pres. To Gov. 6/17/2011 | |
2011-06-16 | Ratified | |
2011-06-16 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2011-06-15 | Placed On Cal For 6/15/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-15 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2011-06-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-14 | Placed On Cal For 6/14/2011 | |
2011-06-14 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-06-14 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-06-10 | Ref To Com On Pensions & Retirement and Aging | |
2011-06-10 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-10 | Rec From House | |
2011-06-09 | Ordered Engrossed | |
2011-06-09 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-09 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-06-08 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Placed On Cal For 6/8/2011 | |
2011-06-08 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-08 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-06-02 | Re-ref Com On State Personnel | |
2011-06-02 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-05-31 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-05-31 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-04-07 | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Finance | |
2011-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-06 | Filed |