NC H735 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Hearing: Jun 27 @ 1:30 pm in 1027/1128 LB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt Rules Incorporating 2017 Food Code

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt Rules Incorporating 2017 Food Code

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-26SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-20SenateRe-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-20SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-06SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-06SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-05-03HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-02HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-02HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-01HousePlaced On Cal For 05/02/2019
2019-05-01HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-01HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-30HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-30HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-15HouseRef to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-15HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-11HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback