NC H747 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-7)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Ch. SL 2019-90
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

NC Missing Person Information Sharing

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NC Missing Person Information Sharing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08 Ch. SL 2019-90
2019-07-08 Signed by Gov. 7/8/2019
2019-06-28 Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2019
2019-06-27 Ratified
2019-06-27HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-06-27HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2019-06-26HousePlaced On Cal For 06/27/2019
2019-06-26HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-06-26HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-06-26SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-06-26SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-26SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-25SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-18SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-18SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-18SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-06SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-06SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-02SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-02SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-02SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-05-01HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-30HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-30HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-29HousePlaced On Cal For 04/30/2019
2019-04-29HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-29HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-26HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-26HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-16HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-16HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-15HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback