NC H748 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on August 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-02 - Ch. SL 2010-170
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Citizens United Response

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Citizens United Response

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-07-09 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-09 - Senate - Motion 2\Prev Question (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-09 - Senate - Amendment 11\Motion 1\To Table (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-09 - Senate - Amendment 10 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-09 - Senate - Amendment 8 (Y: 0 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-07-09 - Senate - Amendment 7 (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-08 - Senate - Amendment 5 (Y: 0 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2010-07-08 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-08 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-08 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-08 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-08-02 Ch. SL 2010-170
2010-08-02 Signed By Gov. 8/2/2010
2010-07-10 Pres. To Gov. 7/10/2010
2010-07-10 Ratified
2010-07-10 Concurred In S/Com Sub
2010-07-10 Concurred In S Amend 10
2010-07-10 Concurred In S Amend 7
2010-07-10 Concurred In S Amend 4
2010-07-10 Concurred In S Amend 3
2010-07-10 Concurred In S Amend 2
2010-07-10 Concurred In S Amend 1
2010-07-10 Placed On Cal For 7/10/2010
2010-07-10 Rec To Concur S Com Sub as amended
2010-07-09 Passed 3rd Reading
2010-07-09 Amend Tabled # 11
2010-07-09 Amend Adopted # 10
2010-07-09 Amend Failed # 8
2010-07-09 Amend Adopted # 7
2010-07-08 Passed 2nd Reading
2010-07-08 Amend Failed # 5
2010-07-08 Amend Adopted # 4
2010-07-08 Amend Adopted # 3
2010-07-08 Amend Adopted # 2
2010-07-08 Amend Adopted # 1
2010-07-07 Com Substitute Adopted
2010-07-07 Reptd Fav Com Substitute
2009-05-05 Ref To Com On Judiciary I
2009-05-05 Rec From House
2009-05-04 Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading
2009-04-30 Placed On Cal For 5/4/2009
2009-04-30 Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2009-04-30 Reptd Fav
2009-04-08 Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
2009-04-08 Reptd Fav
2009-03-24 Ref to the Com on Election Law and Campaign Finance Reform, if favorable, Judiciary I
2009-03-24 Passed 1st Reading
2009-03-23 Filed

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H748&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H748v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H748v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H748v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H748v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H748v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H748v5.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/House/HTML/H748v6.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1564
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1565
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1566
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1567
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1568
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1569
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1599
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1600
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1601
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1602
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1603
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1604

Bill Comments

feedback