NC H75 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - Ch. SL 2019-222
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

School Safety Funds, Programs, and Reports

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Safety Funds, Programs, and Reports

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-16 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - A1 Speciale Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-18 Ch. SL 2019-222
2019-09-18 Signed by Gov. 9/18/2019
2019-09-18 Pres. To Gov. 9/18/2019
2019-09-17 Ratified
2019-09-16HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-09-16HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2019-09-13HousePlaced On Cal For 09/16/2019
2019-09-12HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-09-11HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-09-11SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-09-11SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-09-11SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-09-10SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-09-10SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-09-10SenateSequential Referral To Rules and Operations of the Senate Stricken
2019-09-06SenateRe-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-09-06SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-07SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-07SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-07SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-03-07HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-03-06HouseOrdered Engrossed
2019-03-06HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-06HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-06HouseAmend Adopted A1
2019-03-04HousePlaced On Cal For 03/06/2019
2019-03-04HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-03-04HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-02-26HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-26HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-02-21HouseRe-ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-21HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-02-14HouseRef to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-14HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-13HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H75
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H75v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H75v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H75v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H75v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H75v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H75v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H75v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H75v7.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/34
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/33
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/587
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/819

Bill Comments

feedback