NC H751 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-24 - Ch. SL 2011-302
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-24 - Ch. SL 2011-302
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Various Economic Development Incentives
Title
Various Economic Development Incentives
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-17 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 73 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 85 N: 31 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 85 N: 31 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-24 | Ch. SL 2011-302 | |
2011-06-24 | Signed By Gov. 6/24/2011 | |
2011-06-20 | Pres. To Gov. 6/20/2011 | |
2011-06-18 | Ratified | |
2011-06-17 | Concurred in S/Com Sub as Amended | |
2011-06-16 | Placed On Cal For 6/17/2011 | |
2011-06-16 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-16 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2011-06-16 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-16 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2011-06-16 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-16 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-06-15 | Placed On Cal For 6/15/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-06-15 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-06-15 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2011-06-15 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-15 | Rec From House | |
2011-06-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-14 | Placed On Cal For 6/14/2011 | |
2011-06-14 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-14 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-07 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2011-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-06 | Filed |