NC H758 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources Committee
Hearing: Jun 27 @ 10:00 am in 1124/1224 LB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

MSD Expansion and Governance

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MSD Expansion and Governance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-21SenateRe-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-21SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-31SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-31SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-31SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-05-30HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-29HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-28HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-23HousePlaced On Cal For 05/28/2019
2019-05-23HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-23HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-05-22HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-22HouseReptd Fav
2019-05-02HouseRe-ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-02HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-29HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-29HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-22HouseRe-ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-22HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-16HouseRef to the Com on Environment, if favorable, State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-16HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-15HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback