NC H76 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

School Safety Omnibus

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Safety Omnibus

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - A6 Insko Third Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - A7 Smith, K. M4 Previous Question Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - A7 Smith, K. Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - A1 White Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - A2 White Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - A3 Torbett Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - A4 Ball Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - A5 Farmer-Butterfield Second Reading (Y: 54 N: 57 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-11SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-11SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-03-08HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-03-07HouseOrdered Engrossed
2019-03-07HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-07HouseAmend Adopted A7
2019-03-07HouseAmend Adopted A6
2019-03-06HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-06HouseAmend Failed A5
2019-03-06HouseAmend Adopted A4
2019-03-06HouseAmend Adopted A3
2019-03-06HouseAmend Adopted A2
2019-03-06HouseAmend Adopted A1
2019-03-05HousePlaced On Cal For 03/06/2019
2019-03-05HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-03-05HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-02-27HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-27HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-02-14HouseRef to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-14HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-13HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H76
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H76v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H76v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H76v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H76v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H76v4.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/40
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/39
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/38
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/37
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/36
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/35
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/49
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/50
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/48
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/47

Bill Comments

feedback