NC H764 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Women's Cancer Research & Prevent. Task Force
Title
Women's Cancer Research & Prevent. Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-04-29 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-04-26 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-25 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/26/2019 |
2019-04-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-16 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-15 | House | Filed |