NC H783 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Ch. SL 2013-275
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Pyrotechnics Technical and Conforming Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pyrotechnics Technical and Conforming Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-07-09 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-18 Ch. SL 2013-275
2013-07-18 Signed by Gov. 7/18/2013
2013-07-11 Pres. To Gov. 7/11/2013
2013-07-10 Ratified
2013-07-09HouseOrdered Enrolled
2013-07-09HouseConcurred In S/Com Sub
2013-07-08HousePlaced On Cal For 07/09/2013
2013-07-08HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2013-07-03HouseRec To Concur S Com Sub
2013-07-03HouseRec From Senate
2013-07-02SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2013-07-02SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2013-07-01SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2013-07-01SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2013-06-06SenateRe-ref Com On Judiciary II
2013-06-06SenateWithdrawn From Com
2013-05-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2013-05-06SenatePassed 1st Reading
2013-05-06SenateRec From House
2013-05-02HousePassed 3rd Reading
2013-05-02HousePassed 2nd Reading
2013-05-01HousePlaced On Cal For 05/02/2013
2013-05-01HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2013-05-01HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2013-04-24HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2013-04-24HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2013-04-22HouseAssigned To Regulatory Reform Subcommittee on Business and Labor
2013-04-11HouseRef to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Finance
2013-04-11HousePassed 1st Reading
2013-04-10HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2013&BillID=H783&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/House/HTML/H783v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/House/HTML/H783v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/House/HTML/H783v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/House/HTML/H783v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/House/HTML/H783v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/House/HTML/H783v5.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2013/Bills/House/HTML/H783v6.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=H&RCS=454
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=S&RCS=706
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2013&sChamber=H&RCS=1115

Bill Comments

feedback