NC H789 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-06 - Ref To Com On Judiciary I
Pending: House Judiciary I Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-06 - Ref To Com On Judiciary I
Pending: House Judiciary I Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enhance Protection of Victims & Witnesses
Title
Enhance Protection of Victims & Witnesses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2010-07-06 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-07-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-19 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-13 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-12 | Placed On Cal For 5/13/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-12 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-07 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-05-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-26 | Ref to the Com on Environment and Natural Resources, if favorable, Judiciary I | |
2009-03-26 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S586 (Same As) 2009-07-10 - Ch. SL 2009-269