NC H799 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-24 - Ch. SL 2012-196
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-24 - Ch. SL 2012-196
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Licensure by Endorsement/Military/Spouses
Title
Licensure by Endorsement/Military/Spouses
Sponsors
Sen. William Cook [R] | Rep. Elmer Floyd [D] | Rep. Susan Hamilton [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] |
Rep. Kelly Hastings [R] | Rep. Dwight Horn [R] | Rep. Richard Killian [R] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] |
Rep. David Martin [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-07-02 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - House - A2 Martin\Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-03 - House - A1 Stam\Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - House - A2 Martin\Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-03 - House - A1 Stam\Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-24 | Ch. SL 2012-196 | |
2012-07-24 | Signed By Gov. 7/24/2012 | |
2012-07-03 | Pres. To Gov. 7/3/2012 | |
2012-07-02 | Ratified | |
2012-07-02 | Concurred in S/Com Sub 2 | |
2012-06-29 | Placed On Cal For 7/2/2012 | |
2012-06-29 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-29 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2012-06-28 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-06-28 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-28 | Placed On Cal For 6/28/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-06-28 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2012-06-28 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2012-06-28 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2012-06-27 | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2012-06-27 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2012-06-07 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2012-06-07 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2012-06-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-06-07 | Ref to Commerce. If fav, re-ref to Finance | |
2011-06-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-07 | Rec From House | |
2011-06-06 | Ordered Engrossed | |
2011-06-06 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-06 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2011-06-03 | Placed On Cal For 6/6/2011 | |
2011-06-03 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-03 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-06-03 | Placed On Cal For 6/3/2011 | |
2011-06-03 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-03 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-05-19 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-05-19 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-04-07 | Ref to the Com on Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs, if favorable, Finance | |
2011-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-06 | Filed |