NC H80 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Ch. SL 2019-98
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Roanoke Rapids Lake/Unattended Equip

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Roanoke Rapids Lake/Unattended Equip

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-08 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09 Ch. SL 2019-98
2019-07-09 Ratified
2019-07-08HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-07-08HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2019-07-04HousePlaced On Cal For 07/08/2019
2019-07-04HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-07-02HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-07-02SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-07-02SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-02SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-01SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-26SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-26SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-26SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-20SenateRe-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-20SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-21SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-21SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-21SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-03-21HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-03-20HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-20HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-18HousePlaced On Cal For 03/20/2019
2019-03-18HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-03-18HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-12HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-12HouseReptd Fav
2019-02-14HouseRe-ref to the Com on Wildlife Resources, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-14HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-02-14HouseRef to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-14HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-13HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback