NC H807 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-04 - Ch. SL 2020-96
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-04 - Ch. SL 2020-96
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Championship NC Act
Title
Championship NC Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-03 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 102 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-04 | Ch. SL 2020-96 | |
2020-09-04 | Signed by Gov. 9/4/2020 | |
2020-09-03 | Pres. To Gov. 9/3/2020 | |
2020-09-03 | Ratified | |
2020-09-03 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-09-03 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2020-09-02 | House | Placed On Cal For 09/03/2020 |
2020-09-02 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2020-09-02 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Commerce and Insurance |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-05-06 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-03 | House | Added to Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-05-03 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-02 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-02 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-18 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-16 | House | Filed |