NC H809 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-21 - Re-ref Com On Insurance
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-21 - Re-ref Com On Insurance
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Third-Party Premium Payments
Title
Third-Party Premium Payments
Sponsors
Rep. Marilyn Avila [R] | Rep. David Lewis [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Collins [R] | Rep. Mitchell Setzer [R] |
Rep. Susan Martin [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 100 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Insurance |
2015-07-21 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-07-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Insurance |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-23 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-22 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/22/2015 |
2015-04-21 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-21 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-15 | House | Ref To Com On Insurance |
2015-04-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S582 (Same As) 2015-04-09 - Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Insurance