NC H809 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Honor the Life and Memory of Robert Dalrymple
Title
Honor the Life and Memory of Robert Dalrymple
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2017-04-24 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-24 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-21 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/24/2017 |
2017-04-21 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-21 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-13 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-04-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-11 | House | Filed |