NC H812 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Ch. SL 2019-86
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Ch. SL 2019-86
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Nutrient Offset Amendments
Title
Nutrient Offset Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Donna White [R] | Rep. John Bell [R] | Rep. Charles McGrady [R] | Rep. Brenden Jones [R] |
Rep. Lawrence Yarborough [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 75 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 75 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | Ch. SL 2019-86 | |
2019-07-08 | Signed by Gov. 7/8/2019 | |
2019-06-28 | Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2019 | |
2019-06-27 | Ratified | |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-05-03 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/02/2019 |
2019-05-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-05-01 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-30 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-30 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-18 | House | Ref to the Com on Environment, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-16 | House | Filed |