NC H813 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-28 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-28 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Howard Hunter, Jr., Eastern Crime Lab
Title
Howard Hunter, Jr., Eastern Crime Lab
Sponsors
Rep. David Lewis [R] | Rep. John Bell [R] | Rep. Michael Wray [D] | Rep. Howard Hunter [D] |
Rep. Cynthia Ball [D] | Rep. John Faircloth [R] | Rep. Susan Fisher [D] | Rep. Elmer Floyd [D] |
Rep. Rosa Gill [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Darren Jackson [D] | Rep. Joe John [D] |
Rep. Carolyn Logan [D] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. Amos Quick [D] | Rep. Raymond Smith [D] |
Rep. John Szoka [R] | Rep. Evelyn Terry [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-28 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-05-03 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-02 | House | Added to Calendar |
2019-05-02 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/03/2019 |
2019-05-02 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-05-02 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-01 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-01 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-18 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-18 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-18 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-16 | House | Filed |