NC H816 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 31 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-31 - Ch. SL 2009-396
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 31 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-31 - Ch. SL 2009-396
Summary
Clarify Local Special Separation Allowance.
Title
Clarify Local Special Separation Allowance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-31 | Ch. SL 2009-396 | |
2009-07-31 | Signed By Gov. 7/31/2009 | |
2009-07-24 | Pres. To Gov. 7/24/2009 | |
2009-07-23 | Ratified | |
2009-07-22 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2009-07-20 | Placed On Cal For 7/21/2009 | |
2009-07-20 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-20 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-07-15 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-13 | Placed On Cal For 7/15/2009 | |
2009-07-13 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-07-09 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-07-09 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-20 | Ref To Com On Pensions & Retirement & Aging | |
2009-05-12 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-11 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Placed On Cal For 5/11/2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-06 | Assigned To Appropriations Subcommittee on Justice and Public Safety | |
2009-04-29 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2009-04-29 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-30 | Ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-03-30 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S986 (Same As) 2009-07-01 - Re-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H816 |