NC H816 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Ch. SL 2013-311
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Ch. SL 2013-311
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Tobacco Growers Assessment Act
Title
Tobacco Growers Assessment Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-10 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-10 - House - Third Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-10 - House - Third Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-18 | Ch. SL 2013-311 | |
2013-07-18 | Signed by Gov. 7/18/2013 | |
2013-07-15 | Pres. To Gov. 7/12/2013 | |
2013-07-11 | Ratified | |
2013-07-10 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-07-10 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2013-07-09 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/10/2013 |
2013-07-09 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2013-07-09 | House | Rec To Concur S Com Sub |
2013-07-09 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Senate Clerk's Office |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Held in Senate Clerk's Office |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/02/2013 |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Senate Clerk's Office |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Held in Senate Clerk's Office |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-06-10 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-07 | House | Postponed To 06/10/2013 |
2013-06-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-05 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/06/2013 |
2013-06-05 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-06-05 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-05-15 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-05-15 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-05-14 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/15/2013 |
2013-05-14 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-14 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-11 | House | Ref To Com On Agriculture |
2013-04-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-10 | House | Filed |