NC H817 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-549
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-549
Summary
Ethics TC and Other Changes.
Title
Ethics TC and Other Changes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-28 | Ch. SL 2009-549 | |
2009-08-28 | Signed By Gov. 8/28/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Pres. To Gov. 8/11/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Ratified | |
2009-08-10 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2009-08-06 | Placed On Cal For 8/10/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Conf Com Reported | |
2009-08-06 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2009-08-06 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Conf Com Reported | |
2009-08-06 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2009-08-06 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2009-08-06 | Failed concur in S/Com Sub | |
2009-08-06 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-06 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-08-05 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-05 | Amend Adopted #1 | |
2009-08-04 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-08-04 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-07-29 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-05-19 | Held by Senate | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-13 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-12 | Placed On Cal For 5/13/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-12 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-11 | Assigned To Appropriations Subcommittee on Education | |
2009-04-14 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2009-04-14 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-30 | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-03-30 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1019 (Same As) 2009-07-10 - Ch. SL 2009-265
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H817 |