NC H836 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on September 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-10 - Ch. SL 2009-575
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on September 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-10 - Ch. SL 2009-575
Summary
Modify Appropriations Act.
Title
Modify Appropriations Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-10 | Ch. SL 2009-575 | |
2009-09-10 | Signed By Gov. 9/10/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Pres. To Gov. 8/11/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Ratified | |
2009-08-10 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2009-08-07 | Placed On Cal For 8/10/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-07 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-08-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-07 | Amend Adopted #3 | |
2009-08-07 | Amendment Withdrawn #2 | |
2009-08-07 | Amend Adopted #1 | |
2009-08-07 | Placed On Cal For 8/7/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-08-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-08-07 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2009-08-07 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-05-14 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-12 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-11 | Placed On Cal For 5/12/2009 | |
2009-05-11 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-11 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-05 | Re-ref Com On Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity | |
2009-05-05 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-30 | Ref to the Com on Judiciary III, if favorable, Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity | |
2009-03-30 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S713 (Same As) 2011-05-25 - Ref To Com On Commerce and Job Development
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H836 |