NC H87 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
License Plate Reader Systems in State ROWs
Title
License Plate Reader Systems in State ROWs
Sponsors
Rep. John Faircloth [R] | Rep. John Torbett [R] | Rep. Allen McNeill [R] | Rep. Stephen Ross [R] |
Rep. Howard Hunter [D] | Rep. Shelly Willingham [D] | Rep. Michael Wray [D] | Rep. Lawrence Yarborough [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 59 N: 57 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-05-06 - House - M6 Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 69 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-05-06 - House - M6 Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 102 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - M6 Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 69 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-05-06 - House - M6 Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 102 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-06 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-05-06 | House | Reconsidered 3rd Reading |
2019-05-06 | House | Failed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-06 | House | Reconsidered 3rd Reading |
2019-05-06 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/06/2019 |
2019-05-03 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-05-03 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-25 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-02-18 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-02-18 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed |