NC H882 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-9)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Early Childhood Recommendations/DHHS

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early Childhood Recommendations/DHHS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-06SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-06SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-05-06HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-03HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-03HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-03HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-05-03HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-03HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-05-02HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-02HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-22HouseRef to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-22HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-16HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback