NC H884 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-01 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-01 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Township ABC Elections
Title
Amend Township ABC Elections
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Brown [R] | Rep. John Bell [R] | Rep. Nelson Dollar [R] | Rep. Susan Martin [R] |
Rep. Paul Stam [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-07-01 - House - M6 Reconsider (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 20 N: 83 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 21 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-04-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-07-01 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 20 N: 83 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 21 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-04-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2016-07-01 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-07-01 | House | Reconsidered Concurrence |
2016-07-01 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2016-06-30 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/01/2016 |
2016-06-30 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-30 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-06-28 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2016-06-28 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Reconsidered 2nd Reading |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Failed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Health Care |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Appropriations/Base Budget Added |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Finance Added |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Health Care Added |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Re-ref Com On State and Local Government |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-22 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-21 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-21 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-21 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-15 | House | Ref To Com On Education - Universities |
2015-04-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H323 (Same As) 2015-03-24 - Ref To Com On Appropriations