NC H901 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Ch. SL 2010-35
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Ch. SL 2010-35
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Honors Courses in Healthful Living Classes
Title
Honors Courses in Healthful Living Classes
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Faison [D] | Rep. Jean Farmer-Butterfield [D] | Rep. Richard Glazier [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] |
Rep. Verla Insko [D] | Rep. Paul Luebke [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Ch. SL 2010-35 | |
2010-07-01 | Signed By Gov. 7/1/2010 | |
2010-06-29 | Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2010 | |
2010-06-28 | Ratified | |
2010-06-24 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-23 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-07 | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2009-05-07 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-06 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-05 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-05-04 | Placed On Cal For 5/5/2009 | |
2009-05-04 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-04 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-04-15 | Assigned To Education Subcommittee on Pre-School, Elementary and Secondary Education | |
2009-04-13 | Re-ref Com On Education | |
2009-04-13 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-31 | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Education | |
2009-03-31 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-30 | Filed |