NC H91 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

ABC Laws Modernization/PED Study

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ABC Laws Modernization/PED Study

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-04-16HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-02-19HouseRef to the Com on Alcoholic Beverage Control, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-19HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S87 (Same As) 2019-02-20 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback