NC H910 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-08 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-08 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Gov't Health Plans/ Limited Abortion Coverage
Title
Gov't Health Plans/ Limited Abortion Coverage
Sponsors
Rep. George Cleveland [R] | Rep. Earl Jones [D] | Rep. Jonathan Jordan [R] | Rep. Stephen LaRoque [R] |
Rep. Paul Stam [R] | Rep. Edgar Starnes [R] | Rep. Harry Warren [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-08 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-06-08 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-06-08 | Placed On Cal For 6/8/2011 | |
2011-06-08 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-08 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-05-05 | Ref To Com On State Personnel | |
2011-05-05 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-05-04 | Filed |