NC H924 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Ch. SL 2019-82
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Ch. SL 2019-82
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Teacher Contract Changes
Title
Teacher Contract Changes
Sponsors
Rep. Destin Hall [R] | Rep. Dwight Horn [R] | Rep. Carla Cunningham [D] | Rep. Rosa Gill [D] |
Rep. Raymond Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 73 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 19 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 19 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | Ch. SL 2019-82 | |
2019-07-08 | Signed by Gov. 7/8/2019 | |
2019-06-28 | Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2019 | |
2019-06-27 | Ratified | |
2019-06-27 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-06-27 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/27/2019 |
2019-06-24 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-06-19 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/24/2019 |
2019-06-19 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2019-06-18 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Amend Failed A1 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/17/2019 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/13/2019 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-05-06 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/03/2019 |
2019-05-02 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-05-02 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2019-04-30 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-30 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-22 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-16 | House | Filed |