NC H934 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-05 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Status: Introduced on March 31 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-05 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Summary
Local Employees' Retirement System COLAs.
Title
Local Employees' Retirement System COLAs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2009-05-05 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-04-29 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-04-29 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-01 | Ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-04-01 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-31 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H934 |