NC H934 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Ch. SL 2019-70
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Right to Try Adult Stem Cell Treatments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Right to Try Adult Stem Cell Treatments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-24 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Ch. SL 2019-70
2019-07-01 Signed by Gov. 7/1/2019
2019-06-26 Pres. To Gov. 6/26/2019
2019-06-25 Ratified
2019-06-24HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-06-24HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2019-06-20HousePlaced On Cal For 06/24/2019
2019-06-20HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-06-20HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-06-20SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-06-20SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-20SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-19SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/20/2019
2019-06-19SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-06-18SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-13SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-13SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-13SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-05-29SenateRe-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-29SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-06SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-06SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-05-03HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-02HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-02HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-01HousePlaced On Cal For 05/02/2019
2019-05-01HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-01HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-30HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-30HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-22HouseRef to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-22HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-16HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback