NC H946 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-19 - Ref To Com On State and Local Government
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-19 - Ref To Com On State and Local Government
Summary
Bear Paw Service District/Motor Vehicle Laws.
Title
Bear Paw Service District/Motor Vehicle Laws.
Sponsors
Rep. Roger West [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Placed On Cal For 5/14/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-13 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-05-13 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-05-13 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-01 | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-04-01 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-31 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H946 |