NC H951 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-01 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-01 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminate Tax Designation for Political Party
Title
Eliminate Tax Designation for Political Party
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-17 - House - Second Reading (Y: 76 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Senate Clerk's Office |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Held in Senate Clerk's Office |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Ref To Com On Finance |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-06-17 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-17 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-12 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/17/2013 |
2013-06-12 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-06-12 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-05-08 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-05-08 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-17 | House | Ref to the Com on Elections, if favorable, Finance |
2013-04-17 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-16 | House | Filed |