NC H958 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-27 - Ch. SL 2016-34
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-27 - Ch. SL 2016-34
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Felony Death Imp. Boating/Sheyenne's Law
Title
Felony Death Imp. Boating/Sheyenne's Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-27 | Ch. SL 2016-34 | |
2016-06-27 | Signed by Gov. 6/27/2016 | |
2016-06-17 | Pres. To Gov. 6/17/2016 | |
2016-06-16 | Ratified | |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary I. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Ref to Judiciary II. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2016-05-12 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2016-05-12 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-05-12 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-05-11 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/12/2016 |
2016-05-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2016-04-26 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary I |
2016-04-26 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-04-25 | House | Filed |