NC H959 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on April 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-27 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-27 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Large Mfg. Facility Extension/Study of 1%/$80
Title
Large Mfg. Facility Extension/Study of 1%/$80
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Malone [R] | Rep. David Lewis [R] | Rep. Edgar Starnes [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Collins [R] |
Rep. Richard Glazier [D] | Rep. Kenneth Goodman [D] | Rep. Larry Pittman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-06-27 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-06-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/27/2013 |
2013-06-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-06-27 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-18 | House | Ref To Com On Finance |
2013-04-18 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-17 | House | Filed |