NC H959 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - Ch. SL 2016-90
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - Ch. SL 2016-90
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
DOT Proposed Legislative Changes
Title
DOT Proposed Legislative Changes
Sponsors
Rep. Francis Iler [R] | Rep. John Torbett [R] | Rep. John Faircloth [R] | Rep. Howard Hunter [D] |
Rep. Paul Tine [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 90 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - Third Reading (Y: 104 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - A3 Luebke Third Reading (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - A2 Brody Third Reading (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - A1 Burr Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - House - Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 90 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - Third Reading (Y: 104 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - A3 Luebke Third Reading (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - A2 Brody Third Reading (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - A1 Burr Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - House - Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-11 | Ch. SL 2016-90 | |
2016-07-11 | Signed by Gov. 7/11/2016 | |
2016-07-01 | Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2016 | |
2016-07-01 | Ratified | |
2016-06-30 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2016-06-29 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2016-06-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2016-06-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-29 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/30/2016 |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2016-06-22 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2016-06-22 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2016-06-21 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/22/2016 |
2016-06-21 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2016-06-20 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Ref To Com On Transportation |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2016-06-02 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2016-06-02 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2016-06-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-02 | House | Amend Adopted A3 |
2016-06-02 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2016-06-02 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2016-06-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/02/2016 |
2016-06-01 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-05-31 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-05-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/31/2016 |
2016-05-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-05-25 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-04-26 | House | Ref To Com On Transportation |
2016-04-26 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-04-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S723 (Same As) 2016-04-26 - Ref To Com On Transportation