NC H961 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-06 - Ref To Com On Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Jury Service/Exempt From Ferry Tolls

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jury Service/Exempt From Ferry Tolls

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 102 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-06 Ref To Com On Transportation
2012-06-06 Passed 1st Reading
2012-06-06 Rec From House
2012-06-05 Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading
2012-06-05 Placed On Cal For 6/5/2012
2012-06-05 Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2012-06-05 Reptd Fav
2012-05-17 Ref To Com On Transportation
2012-05-17 Passed 1st Reading
2012-05-16 Filed

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback