NC H961 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-07 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Required Training Police Telecommunicators

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Required Training Police Telecommunicators

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-07SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2018-06-07SenatePassed 1st Reading
2018-06-07SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2018-06-07HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2018-06-07HousePassed 3rd Reading
2018-06-07HousePassed 2nd Reading
2018-06-06HousePlaced On Cal For 06/07/2018
2018-06-06HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2018-06-06HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2018-05-21HouseRef To Com On Judiciary II
2018-05-21HousePassed 1st Reading
2018-05-17HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S721 (Same As) 2018-06-12 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback