NC H961 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Ch. SL 2019-192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Ensuring Authorization of Federal Funds

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ensuring Authorization of Federal Funds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-24 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-07-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-01 Ch. SL 2019-192
2019-08-01 Signed by Gov. 8/1/2019
2019-07-26 Pres. To Gov. 7/26/2019
2019-07-25 Ratified
2019-07-24HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-07-24HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2019-07-23HousePlaced On Cal For 07/24/2019
2019-07-23HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-07-23HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-07-22SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-07-22SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-22SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-22SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2019-07-22SenateReptd Fav
2019-07-16SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-07-16SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-07-16SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-05-24SenateRe-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-24SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-06SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-06SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-05-06HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-03HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-03HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-02HousePlaced On Cal For 05/03/2019
2019-05-02HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-05-01HousePlaced On Cal For 05/02/2019
2019-05-01HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-01HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-30HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-30HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-26HouseRef to the Com on Appropriations, Education, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-26HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-25HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback