NC H969 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-18 - Ch. SL 2009-118
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-18 - Ch. SL 2009-118
Summary
Granville/Registered Land.
Title
Granville/Registered Land.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-18 | Ch. SL 2009-118 | |
2009-06-18 | Ratified | |
2009-06-17 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-06-16 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-19 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-13 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-12 | Placed On Cal For 5/13/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-12 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-22 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-04-22 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-02 | Ref to the Com on Wildlife Resources, if favorable, Judiciary II | |
2009-04-02 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H969 |