NC H970 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - Ch. SL 2009-45
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - Ch. SL 2009-45
Summary
Granville County Hunting.
Title
Granville County Hunting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-28 | Ch. SL 2009-45 | |
2009-05-28 | Ratified | |
2009-05-27 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-26 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-11 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2009-05-11 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-06 | Placed On Cal For 5/7/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-06 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-04-22 | Re-ref Com On Wildlife Resources | |
2009-04-22 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-02 | Ref to the Com on Local Government II, if favorable, Wildlife Resources | |
2009-04-02 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H970 |