NC H970 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-23 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-23 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honor UNC-P's Anniversary
Title
Honor UNC-P's Anniversary
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-23 - House - R2 For Adopt (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-23 | Adopted | |
2012-05-22 | Placed On Cal For 5/23/2012 | |
2012-05-22 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-05-22 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-05-17 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2012-05-17 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-16 | Filed |