NC H976 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-20 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enhance Oversight of Service Contracts/PED

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enhance Oversight of Service Contracts/PED

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-16 - House - Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - House - A2 Blackwell Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - House - A1 Bishop Third Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-20SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2016-06-20SenatePassed 1st Reading
2016-06-20SenateRegular Message Received From House
2016-06-16HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2016-06-16HouseOrdered Engrossed
2016-06-16HousePassed 3rd Reading
2016-06-16HouseAmend Adopted A2
2016-06-16HouseAmend Adopted A1
2016-06-15HousePassed 2nd Reading
2016-06-14HousePlaced On Cal For 06/15/2016
2016-06-14HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2016-06-14HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2016-04-27HouseRef To Com On Regulatory Reform
2016-04-27HousePassed 1st Reading
2016-04-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S789 (Same As) 2016-05-02 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2015&BillID=H976&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/House/HTML/H976v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/House/HTML/H976v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/House/HTML/H976v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2015/Bills/House/HTML/H976v3.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=H&RCS=1252
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=H&RCS=1275
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=H&RCS=1276
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2015&sChamber=H&RCS=1277

Bill Comments

feedback